TX HB283 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-14)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 1/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the requirement that certain governmental bodies make audio and video recordings of open meetings available on the Internet.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the requirement that certain governmental bodies make audio and video recordings of open meetings available on the Internet.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-13 - House - HB 283Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - HB 283Third Reading House (Y: 128 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-17 Effective on 1/1/16
2015-06-17 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-28SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-26HouseSenate passage reported
2015-05-25SenateRecord vote
2015-05-25SenatePassed
2015-05-25SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-25SenateRecord vote
2015-05-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-05-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-22SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-20SenatePosting rule suspended
2015-05-15SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2015-05-15SenateRead first time
2015-05-14SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-13HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-13HouseRecord vote
2015-05-13HousePassed as amended
2015-05-13HouseAmended
2015-05-13HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-12HouseRecord vote
2015-05-12HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-05-12HouseAmended
2015-05-12HouseAmended
2015-05-12HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-06HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-22HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-22HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-02-11HouseReferred to Government Transparency & Operation
2015-02-11HouseRead first time
2014-11-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback