TX HB2827 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the permitting of and performance of annual soil tests for certain concentrated animal feeding operations by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Title
Relating to the permitting of and performance of annual soil tests for certain concentrated animal feeding operations by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1103 (Y: 80 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#1066 (Y: 77 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#1066 (Y: 77 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-05 | House | Record vote RV#1103 |
2023-05-05 | House | Passed |
2023-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-04 | House | Record vote RV#1066 |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-04 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) |
2023-05-04 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) |
2023-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Animals
Environment
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LITTER
PERMITS
TEXAS A&M AGRILIFE EXTENSION SERVICE
Environment
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LITTER
PERMITS
TEXAS A&M AGRILIFE EXTENSION SERVICE