TX HB2822 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Pensions, Investments & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to increasing the interest rate and maximum reference base amount of certain consumer loans.
Title
Relating to increasing the interest rate and maximum reference base amount of certain consumer loans.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2277 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2822 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02822I.htm |