TX HB2821 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-14 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-14 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the diversion of certain foster youth from the juvenile justice system, including through emergency behavior intervention by certain persons providing foster care services.
Title
Relating to the diversion of certain foster youth from the juvenile justice system, including through emergency behavior intervention by certain persons providing foster care services.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1060 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-13 | House | Record vote RV#1060 |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-12 | House | Amended 1-White |
2021-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2021-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2085 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Family
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Juvenile Boards & Officers
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Juvenile Boards & Officers
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice