TX HB281 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a limitation on the expansion of certain landfills.
Title
Relating to a limitation on the expansion of certain landfills.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Simmons [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - HB 281Third Reading House (Y: 135 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - HB 281Third Reading House (Y: 109 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - HB 281Third Reading House (Y: 109 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-18 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-11 | House | Passed |
2015-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-08 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2015-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | House | Amendment tabled |
2015-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LANDFILLS
Legislature
PERMITS
City Government--General
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LANDFILLS
Legislature
PERMITS