TX HB2809 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of certain Texas Rangers for burial in the state cemetery.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of certain Texas Rangers for burial in the state cemetery.
Sponsors
Rep. John Cyrier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB2809 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB02809I.htm |