TX HB2806 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Texas music incubator rebate program to provide for rebates of a portion of certain taxes collected from certain music venues and promoters of certain music festivals.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Texas music incubator rebate program to provide for rebates of a portion of certain taxes collected from certain music venues and promoters of certain music festivals.
Sponsors
Rep. Geanie Morrison [R] | Rep. John Cyrier [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
Rep. John Bucy [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#628 (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Read 2nd time RV#565 (Y: 110 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Read 2nd time RV#565 (Y: 110 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#628 |
2019-04-24 | House | Passed |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#565 |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1832 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
Arts & Humanities
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
MUSIC, FILM, TELEVISION, & MULTIMEDIA OFFICE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Taxation
Taxation--Alcoholic Beverages
Taxation--General
Taxation--Sales
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
MUSIC, FILM, TELEVISION, & MULTIMEDIA OFFICE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Taxation
Taxation--Alcoholic Beverages
Taxation--General
Taxation--Sales