TX HB28 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Co-sponsor authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of certain surplus state revenue, in certain circumstances, to adjust franchise tax rates to phase out the franchise tax and to the expiration of that tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of certain surplus state revenue, in certain circumstances, to adjust franchise tax rates to phase out the franchise tax and to the expiration of that tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#565 (Y: 96 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Record vote RV#516 (Y: 98 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#515 (Y: 51 N: 92 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#514 (Y: 52 N: 91 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - House - Amendment as amended fails of adoption RV#513 (Y: 58 N: 85 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#512 (Y: 52 N: 91 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#511 (Y: 54 N: 90 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#510 (Y: 52 N: 89 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - House - Amendment tabled RV#509 (Y: 89 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-18SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-18SenateNo action taken in committee
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-01SenateReferred to Finance
2017-05-01SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-28HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-28HouseRecord vote
2017-04-28HousePassed
2017-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HouseAmendment as amended fails of adoption
2017-04-27HouseAmendment amended
2017-04-27HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-04-27HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HouseAmendment tabled
2017-04-27HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-04-27HousePostponed
2017-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-27HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-21HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-13HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-03-13HouseRead first time
2017-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB28
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00028I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00028H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00028E.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB28&RcdVtNo=509&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB28&RcdVtNo=510&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB28&RcdVtNo=511&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB28&RcdVtNo=512&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB28&RcdVtNo=513&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB28&RcdVtNo=514&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB28&RcdVtNo=515&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB28&RcdVtNo=516&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB28&RcdVtNo=565&Ch=H&Dt=04/28/2017

Bill Comments

feedback