TX HB2770 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the declaration of a common nuisance involving a computer network or web address.
Title
Relating to the declaration of a common nuisance involving a computer network or web address.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#840 (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-05 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-04 | House | Amended |
2017-05-04 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-04-27 | House | Postponed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
INTERNET
NUISANCES
Safety
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
INTERNET
NUISANCES
Safety