TX HB277 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Postponed in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Postponed in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the identification information required of an applicant for a driver's license.
Title
Relating to the identification information required of an applicant for a driver's license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Postponed in subcommittee | |
2011-04-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2011-04-14 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2011-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | |
2011-04-08 | Subcommittee members named | |
2011-04-08 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time | |
2010-11-12 | Filed |
Subjects
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB277 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB00277I.htm |