TX HB2753 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the names of certain businesses.
Title
Relating to the names of certain businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - HB 2753Third Reading House (Y: 22 N: 118 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-29 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-29 | House | Failed to pass |
2015-04-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-28 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |