TX HB2753 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-10 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-10 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to excellence funding for health-related institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to excellence funding for health-related institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-10 - House - HB 2753Third Reading House (Y: 62 N: 73 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2013-05-09 - House - HB 2753Third Reading House (Y: 72 N: 69 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-05-09 - House - HB 2753Third Reading House (Y: 72 N: 69 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-10 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-10 | House | Failed to pass |
2013-05-10 | House | Amended |
2013-05-10 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-05-10 | House | Postponed |
2013-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-09 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-05-09 | House | Postponed |
2013-05-09 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-05-08 | House | Postponed |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control