TX HB2723 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to public notice of the availability on the Internet of property-tax-related information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public notice of the availability on the Internet of property-tax-related information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1242 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#241 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Read 2nd time RV#216 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03 Effective immediately
2021-06-03 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-18HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-18SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-18HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-18HouseRecord vote RV#1242
2021-05-18HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-11HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-11HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-11HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-11SenateRecord vote
2021-05-11SenatePassed
2021-05-11SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-11SenateRecord vote
2021-05-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-05SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-05SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-05SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-04-19SenateRead first time
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-15HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#241
2021-04-15HousePassed
2021-04-15HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-14HouseRecord vote RV#216
2021-04-14HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-14HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1434 (Same As) 2021-04-12 - Left pending in committee
HB3680 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to Ways & Means

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2723
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02723I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02723H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02723E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02723S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02723F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02723I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02723H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02723H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02723E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02723E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02723S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02723S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02723F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2723&RcdVtNo=216&Ch=H&Dt=04/14/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2723&RcdVtNo=241&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-11-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2723&RcdVtNo=1242&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback