TX HB271 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the Veterans Recovery Pilot Program to provide certain veterans with hyperbaric oxygen treatment.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the Veterans Recovery Pilot Program to provide certain veterans with hyperbaric oxygen treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1346 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#231 (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#231 (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-18 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-18 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-18 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-10 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Postponed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-12 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-12 | House | Passed |
2017-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Military & Veterans
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Military & Veterans
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF