TX HB27 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to state economic development measures, including administration of the Texas Enterprise Fund, the abolishment of the Texas emerging technology fund, and the disposition of balances from the Texas emerging technology fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state economic development measures, including administration of the Texas Enterprise Fund, the abolishment of the Texas emerging technology fund, and the disposition of balances from the Texas emerging technology fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-14HousePostponed
2015-05-14HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-05-07HousePostponed
2015-05-07HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-05-01HousePostponed
2015-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-04-28HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-16HouseReferred to Economic & Small Business Development
2015-03-16HouseRead first time
2015-03-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback