TX HB27 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the payment of fines and costs by defendants who are unable to pay the fines and costs in misdemeanor cases.
Title
Relating to the payment of fines and costs by defendants who are unable to pay the fines and costs in misdemeanor cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-16 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-16 | Record vote | |
2011-05-16 | Passed | |
2011-05-16 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-16 | Record vote | |
2011-05-16 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-16 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-16 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-16 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-16 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-13 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-05 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-03 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-05-03 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-04-20 | Read first time | |
2011-04-11 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-11 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-08 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-08 | Record vote | |
2011-04-08 | Passed as amended | |
2011-04-08 | Amended | |
2011-04-08 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-04-08 | Postponed | |
2011-04-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-07 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-07 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-07 | Amended | |
2011-04-07 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-07 | Amended | |
2011-04-07 | Amended | |
2011-04-07 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-04-07 | Postponed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-30 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-29 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-29 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-16 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-16 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-02-09 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed |