TX HB2697 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to telemedicine and telehealth services.
Title
Relating to telemedicine and telehealth services.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
Rep. Robert Guerra [D] | Rep. Celia Israel [D] | Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-10 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-05 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health Care Providers
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
NURSING, TEXAS BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT BOARD, TEXAS
TELEMEDICINE
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
NURSING, TEXAS BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT BOARD, TEXAS
TELEMEDICINE