TX HB269 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to judicial proceedings on a petition to set aside a conviction or an order of expunction of criminal history record information for certain victims of trafficking of persons or compelling prostitution who are convicted of prostitution.
Title
Relating to judicial proceedings on a petition to set aside a conviction or an order of expunction of criminal history record information for certain victims of trafficking of persons or compelling prostitution who are convicted of prostitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#266 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-18 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-18 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-18 | House | Passed |
2017-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
CRIMINAL RECORDS
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
PROSTITUTION
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
CRIMINAL RECORDS
HUMAN TRAFFICKING
PROSTITUTION