TX HB2687 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-15 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-15 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the age at which a juvenile court may exercise jurisdiction over a child and to the minimum age of criminal responsibility.
Title
Relating to the age at which a juvenile court may exercise jurisdiction over a child and to the minimum age of criminal responsibility.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] | Rep. Maria Flores [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1592 (Y: 123 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - Amended RV#1552 (Y: 126 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - Amended RV#1552 (Y: 126 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-12 | House | Record vote RV#1592 |
2023-05-12 | House | Passed |
2023-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#1552 |
2023-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-11 | House | Amended 1-Leach |
2023-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select |
2023-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-23 | House | Filed |