TX HB2686 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Record vote RV#954
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Record vote RV#954
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a dispute relating to a denial of coverage by the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association.
Title
Relating to a dispute relating to a denial of coverage by the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - Failed to pass to engrossment RV#954 (Y: 68 N: 69 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - House - Failed to pass to engrossment RV#950 (Y: 62 N: 66 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - House - Failed to pass to engrossment RV#950 (Y: 62 N: 66 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#954 |
2019-05-02 | House | Failed to pass to engrossment |
2019-05-02 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2019-05-02 | House | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#950 |
2019-05-02 | House | Failed to pass to engrossment |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Insurance
Insurance--Property & Casualty
WINDSTORM DEVICES & INSURANCE
WINDSTORM INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, TEXAS
Insurance--Property & Casualty
WINDSTORM DEVICES & INSURANCE
WINDSTORM INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, TEXAS