TX HB2680 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Summary
Relating to the retrieval and waste of game birds, game animals, and fish; providing a penalty.
Title
Relating to the retrieval and waste of game birds, game animals, and fish; providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2009-05-12 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-14 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-09 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-09 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-07 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-07 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time | |
2009-03-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1121 (Same As) 2009-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Animals
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing