TX HB2677 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to training for employees of school districts and open-enrollment charter schools on the prevention of sexual abuse and other maltreatment of certain children.
Title
Relating to training for employees of school districts and open-enrollment charter schools on the prevention of sexual abuse and other maltreatment of certain children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
SEXUAL ABUSE
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
SEXUAL ABUSE