TX HB2677 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Summary
Relating to the amendment of a birth certificate.
Title
Relating to the amendment of a birth certificate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-05-19 | Read first time | |
2009-05-18 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-18 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-15 | Record vote | |
2009-05-15 | Passed | |
2009-05-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-15 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-12 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-06 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-06 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-06 | Filed |