TX HB265 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the lease of space by or for a state agency.
Title
Relating to the lease of space by or for a state agency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-19 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-13 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-11 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-09 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-09 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Government Organization | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-20 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-19 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-19 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-19 | Record vote | |
2011-04-19 | Passed | |
2011-04-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-18 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-18 | Amended | |
2011-04-18 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-18 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-18 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-08 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-07 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |