TX HB2633 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the release of a motor vehicle accident report.
Title
Relating to the release of a motor vehicle accident report.
Sponsors
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D] | Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D] | Rep. Travis Clardy [R] | Rep. Andrew Murr [R] |
Sen. Charles Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - HB 2633Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - HB 2633Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - HB 2633Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-06-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-31 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-31 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-31 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-30 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2015-05-29 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-27 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-27 | House | House requests conference committee |
2015-05-27 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-06 | House | Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-05 | House | Amended |
2015-05-05 | House | Amended |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2015-03-18 | House | Correction in referral |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ACCIDENTS
Open Records
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
Open Records
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road