TX HB2628 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration and collection of motor vehicle sales and use taxes.
Title
Relating to the administration and collection of motor vehicle sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#798 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#798 |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed |
2021-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |