TX HB2608 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-30 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-28 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-25 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-25 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-25 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-25 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-25 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-25 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Amended | |
2011-05-23 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-16 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-16 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Government Organization | |
2011-05-05 | Read first time | |
2011-05-04 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-04 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-03 | Amended | |
2011-05-03 | Amended | |
2011-05-03 | Amended | |
2011-05-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-02 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-02 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-02 | Point of order sustained (amendment) | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-02 | Amended | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment adopted as amended | |
2011-05-02 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-02 | Record vote | |
2011-05-02 | Motion to table fails | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment amended | |
2011-05-02 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-20 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2011-03-15 | Read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |
Subjects
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills