TX HB2605 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-25 - No action taken in committee
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-25 - No action taken in committee
Summary
Relating to powers of the Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas, pertaining to land in and adjacent to Naval Station Ingleside.
Title
Relating to powers of the Port of Corpus Christi Authority of Nueces County, Texas, pertaining to land in and adjacent to Naval Station Ingleside.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-12 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-03-12 | Read first time | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB835 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Subjects
PORT OF CORPUS CHRISTI AUTHORITY OF NUECES COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports