TX HB26 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 57-25)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to state economic development measures, including administration of the Texas Enterprise Fund, creation of the Economic Incentive Oversight Board and the governor's university research initiative, abolishment of the Texas emerging technology fund, and renaming the Major Events trust fund to the Major Events Reimbursement Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state economic development measures, including administration of the Texas Enterprise Fund, creation of the Economic Incentive Oversight Board and the governor's university research initiative, abolishment of the Texas emerging technology fund, and renaming the Major Events trust fund to the Major Events Reimbursement Program.

Sponsors

Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]
Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Roberto Alonzo [D]Rep. Carol Alvarado [D]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]
Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]
Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Garnet Coleman [D]
Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Byron Cook [R]Rep. Myra Crownover [R]Rep. John Cyrier [R]
Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Gary Elkins [R]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]
Rep. Marsha Farney [R]Rep. Allen Fletcher [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]Rep. Rick Galindo [R]
Rep. Helen Giddings [D]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Larry Gonzales [R]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Robert Guerra [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Patricia Harless [R]
Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]
Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Linda Koop [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]
Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]
Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Doug Miller [R]
Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Sergio Munoz [D]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]
Rep. Elliott Naishtat [D]Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D]Rep. John Otto [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]
Rep. Larry Phillips [R]Rep. Joe Pickett [D]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]
Rep. Debbie Riddle [R]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Kenneth Sheets [R]
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]Rep. Wayne Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Sylvester Turner [D]Rep. Hubert Vo [D]
Rep. James White [R]Rep. Paul Workman [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]
Sen. Troy Fraser [R]Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D]

Roll Calls

2015-05-31 - House - HB 26Third Reading House (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - House - HB 26Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 12 by Leach (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2015-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2015-06-01SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-06-01HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-31HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-31SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2015-05-31HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-31HouseRecord vote
2015-05-31HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2015-05-31HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2015-05-31SenateRecord vote
2015-05-31SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2015-05-30HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2015-05-30SenateConference committee report filed
2015-05-29HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2015-05-29HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2015-05-29SenateSenate appoints conferees
2015-05-29SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2015-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2015-05-28SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2015-05-28SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2015-05-28HouseHouse appoints conferees
2015-05-28HouseHouse requests conference committee
2015-05-28HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2015-05-28HouseCorrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
2015-05-28HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2015-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2015-05-26HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2015-05-26SenateRecord vote
2015-05-26SenatePassed
2015-05-26SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-26SenateRecord vote
2015-05-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-22SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2015-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-05SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2015-05-05SenateRead first time
2015-05-04SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-01HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-01HouseRecord vote
2015-05-01HousePassed as amended
2015-05-01HouseAmended
2015-05-01HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-30HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-04-30HouseAmendment withdrawn
2015-04-30HouseAmendment withdrawn
2015-04-30HouseAmendment withdrawn
2015-04-30HouseVote reconsidered
2015-04-30HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HouseAmended
2015-04-30HouseAmendment withdrawn
2015-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HouseRecord vote
2015-04-30HouseAmended
2015-04-30HouseVote reconsidered
2015-04-30HouseAmended
2015-04-30HouseAmended
2015-04-30HouseAmendment adopted as amended
2015-04-30HouseAmendment amended
2015-04-30HouseAmendment(s) offered
2015-04-30HouseAmended
2015-04-30HouseAmended
2015-04-30HouseAmended
2015-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HouseAmended
2015-04-30HouseAmended
2015-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HouseAmended
2015-04-30HouseAmended
2015-04-30HouseAmended
2015-04-30HouseAmended
2015-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-30HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-04-22HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-21HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-16HouseReferred to Economic & Small Business Development
2015-03-16HouseRead first time
2015-03-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB26
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00026I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00026H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00026E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00026S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00026F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB26&RcdVtNo=478&Ch=H&Dt=04/30/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB26&RcdVtNo=496&Ch=H&Dt=05/01/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB26&RcdVtNo=1822&Ch=H&Dt=05/31/2015

Bill Comments

feedback