TX HB2588 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to disclosures by nursing facilities and assisted living facilities regarding certification or classification to provide specialized care, treatment, or personal care services to residents with Alzheimer's disease or related disorders and the authority of the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission to adopt rules defining those conditions; adding requirements for an occupational license.
Title
Relating to disclosures by nursing facilities and assisted living facilities regarding certification or classification to provide specialized care, treatment, or personal care services to residents with Alzheimer's disease or related disorders and the authority of the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission to adopt rules defining those conditions; adding requirements for an occupational license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - HB 2588Third Reading House (Y: 129 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - HB 2588Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - HB 2588Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-20 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-05 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-05 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-28 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-22 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aging
ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE
ASSISTED LIVING FACILITIES
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Nursing Homes
ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE
ASSISTED LIVING FACILITIES
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Nursing Homes