TX HB2575 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain requirements imposed on a sex offender who enters the premises of a school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain requirements imposed on a sex offender who enters the premises of a school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#773 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-08SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-03HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-03HouseAmended
2017-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-26HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-17HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-04-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-23HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-03-23HouseRead first time
2017-02-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback