TX HB2571 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the inspection of certain information regarding the production, transportation, sale, and marketing of oil and gas from state land; imposing an administrative penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the inspection of certain information regarding the production, transportation, sale, and marketing of oil and gas from state land; imposing an administrative penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - House - HB 2571Third Reading House (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-16HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-15HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-15HouseSenate passage reported
2013-05-15SenateRecord vote
2013-05-15SenatePassed
2013-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-15SenateRecord vote
2013-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-15SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-15SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-02SenateReferred to Natural Resources
2013-05-02SenateRead first time
2013-04-29SenateReceived from the House
2013-04-26HouseReported engrossed
2013-04-26HouseRecord vote
2013-04-26HousePassed
2013-04-26HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-25HousePassed to engrossment
2013-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-04-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-18HouseReferred to Energy Resources
2013-03-18HouseRead first time
2013-03-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback