TX HB2561 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas State Board of Pharmacy and the regulation of certain prescription drugs, prescription drug prescribers and dispensers, and colleges of pharmacy; authorizing a reduction in fees.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas State Board of Pharmacy and the regulation of certain prescription drugs, prescription drug prescribers and dispensers, and colleges of pharmacy; authorizing a reduction in fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1924 (Y: 131 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#604 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - Amendment amended RV#576 (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#604 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - Amendment amended RV#576 (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-26 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted as amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-01 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2017-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | House | Amendment amended |
2017-05-01 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-01 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-01 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Interim Studies
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Interim Studies
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACIES & PHARMACISTS
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills