TX HB2557 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain hospital districts and to certain corporations or organizations formed by those districts.
Title
Relating to certain hospital districts and to certain corporations or organizations formed by those districts.
Sponsors
Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-09 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed |
2015-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2015-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Health
Health--General
Insurance
Insurance--General
Legislature
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Health
Health--General
Insurance
Insurance--General
Legislature
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital