TX HB2557 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a suit for possession of or access to a child by a grandparent.
Title
Relating to a suit for possession of or access to a child by a grandparent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-05 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-15 | Read first time | |
2011-03-08 | Filed |