TX HB2557 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Summary
Relating to the evaluation of highway or other mobility projects as toll projects by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Title
Relating to the evaluation of highway or other mobility projects as toll projects by the Texas Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-04-27 | Read first time | |
2009-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Passed | |
2009-04-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-23 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-08 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-31 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2158 (Same As) 2009-03-31 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.