TX HB2555 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to guidelines for policies of school districts and open-enrollment charter schools for the care of certain students at risk for anaphylaxis.
Title
Relating to guidelines for policies of school districts and open-enrollment charter schools for the care of certain students at risk for anaphylaxis.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB869 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF