TX HB255 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the offense involving the carrying of handguns by license holders on the premises or property of certain recreational facilities.
Title
Relating to the offense involving the carrying of handguns by license holders on the premises or property of certain recreational facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-11 | House | No action taken in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverage Regulation
Amusements, Games, Sports
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Hospitals
Nursing Homes
Religion
Weapons
Amusements, Games, Sports
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Hospitals
Nursing Homes
Religion
Weapons
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB255 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00255I.htm |