TX HB2549 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the periodic review and revision of college and career readiness standards in public education.
Title
Relating to the periodic review and revision of college and career readiness standards in public education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - House - HB 2549Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-02 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-04-02 | House | Correction in referral |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--General
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--State Coordination
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--General
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--State Coordination
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS