TX HB2531 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - No action taken in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - No action taken in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an accommodation process authorizing the use of state highway rights-of-way by broadband-only providers.
Title
Relating to an accommodation process authorizing the use of state highway rights-of-way by broadband-only providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | No action taken in committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB507 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately