TX HB2529 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Summary
Relating to the terms of office of commissioners of certain emergency services districts.
Title
Relating to the terms of office of commissioners of certain emergency services districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | See remarks for effective date | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-21 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Passed | |
2009-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-21 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-13 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-05-01 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-01 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-24 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-23 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR85 (Enabling for) 2009-06-01 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Subjects
Elections
Elections--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Elections--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous