TX HB2525 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-21 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-21 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a mechanic's, contractor's, or materialman's lien for landscaping.
Title
Relating to a mechanic's, contractor's, or materialman's lien for landscaping.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-21 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-16 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-05-16 | Read first time | |
2011-05-16 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-13 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Passed | |
2011-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-13 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-12 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-18 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-13 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-13 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-04 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-04 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-04 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2011-03-14 | Read first time | |
2011-03-08 | Filed |
Subjects
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
LANDSCAPING & LAWN CARE
MATERIALMEN'S LIENS
MECHANICS' LIENS
Property Interests
Property Interests--General
LANDSCAPING & LAWN CARE
MATERIALMEN'S LIENS
MECHANICS' LIENS
Property Interests
Property Interests--General