TX HB2521 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to establishing an intergovernmental development corporation in certain counties to foster minority- or women-owned construction businesses.
Title
Relating to establishing an intergovernmental development corporation in certain counties to foster minority- or women-owned construction businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB920 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Subjects
BUILDING CONSTRUCTION
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
County Government
County Government--General
DEVELOPMENT CORPORATIONS
Intergovernmental Relations
Political Subdivisions
Women
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
County Government
County Government--General
DEVELOPMENT CORPORATIONS
Intergovernmental Relations
Political Subdivisions
Women
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2521 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02521I.htm |