TX HB2521 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a project authorized to be undertaken by a Type B economic development corporation in connection with housing.
Title
Relating to a project authorized to be undertaken by a Type B economic development corporation in connection with housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2013-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
DEVELOPMENT CORPORATIONS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Housing
Housing--General
Business & Commerce--General
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
DEVELOPMENT CORPORATIONS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Housing
Housing--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB2521 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB02521I.htm |