TX HB2521 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-26 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-26 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Bell County Municipal Utility District No. 1; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Bell County Municipal Utility District No. 1; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-11 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-08 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-07 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-03-31 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2011-03-30 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-29 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-29 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-24 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-24 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-03-14 | Read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2011-03-08 | Filed |
Subjects
BELL COUNTY MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility