TX HB2519 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to alternative methods of obtaining criminal history information and registration of private vendors to obtain criminal history information; providing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to alternative methods of obtaining criminal history information and registration of private vendors to obtain criminal history information; providing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-24 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-23 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-16 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
CRIMINAL RECORDS
SECRETARY OF STATE
Business & Commerce--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
CRIMINAL RECORDS
SECRETARY OF STATE