TX HB25 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the elimination of straight-party voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the elimination of straight-party voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-20 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1451 (Y: 89 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Record vote RV#978 (Y: 88 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#977 (Y: 54 N: 91 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-05-06 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#976 (Y: 53 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-05-06 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#975 (Y: 55 N: 89 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - House - Amended RV#881 (Y: 85 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#880 (Y: 56 N: 88 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#879 (Y: 53 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#878 (Y: 54 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#877 (Y: 53 N: 89 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#876 (Y: 53 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#875 (Y: 53 N: 91 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#874 (Y: 53 N: 91 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#873 (Y: 57 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01 Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
2017-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-20HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-20HouseRecord vote
2017-05-20HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-19HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-19HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-18HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-18SenateStatement(s) submitted
2017-05-18SenateRecord vote
2017-05-18SenatePassed
2017-05-18SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-18SenateRecord vote
2017-05-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-17SenateRemarks ordered printed
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-17SenateAmended
2017-05-17SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-17SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-17SenateRecord vote
2017-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-11SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-08SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-05HouseAmended
2017-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-05HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-05-05HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2017-05-05HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-05HousePostponed
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-03-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-03-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-03-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Elections
2017-02-16HouseRead first time
2017-02-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB25
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00025I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00025H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00025E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00025S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00025F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=873&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=874&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=875&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=876&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=877&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=878&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=879&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=880&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=881&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=975&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=976&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=977&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=978&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-17-F.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-18-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB25&RcdVtNo=1451&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-17-F.PDF#page=4

Bill Comments

feedback