TX HB2492 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to designating April 16 as Selena Quintanilla Pérez Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to designating April 16 as Selena Quintanilla Pérez Day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-24HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-24HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback