TX HB2490 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Summary
Relating to the designation of the Diamond Interchange.
Title
Relating to the designation of the Diamond Interchange.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-05-05 | Read first time | |
2009-05-01 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-27 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-24 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-21 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2386 (Same As) 2009-03-31 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.