TX HB249 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-02 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-02 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a school security volunteer program in certain counties.
Title
Relating to a school security volunteer program in certain counties.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Rogers [R] | Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. Cody Harris [R] |
Rep. Brad Buckley [R] | Rep. Ben Bumgarner [R] | Rep. Charles Cunningham [R] | Rep. Frederick Frazier [R] |
Rep. Gary Gates [R] | Rep. Stan Gerdes [R] | Rep. Sam Harless [R] | Rep. Richard Hayes [R] |
Rep. Lacey Hull [R] | Rep. Stan Kitzman [R] | Rep. Stan Lambert [R] | Rep. Janie Lopez [R] |
Rep. John Lujan [R] | Rep. Eddie Morales [D] | Rep. Andrew Murr [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] |
Rep. David Spiller [R] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Rep. Valoree Swanson [R] | Rep. Steve Toth [R] |
Rep. Cody Vasut [R] | Rep. Terry Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - House - Amended RV#164 (Y: 118 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#147 (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#147 (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-12 | House | Record vote RV#164 |
2023-04-12 | House | Passed as amended |
2023-04-12 | House | Amended 2-Moody |
2023-04-12 | House | Amended 1-J.D. Johnson |
2023-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-11 | House | Record vote RV#147 |
2023-04-11 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-11 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2023-04-11 | House | Amended 1-Patterson, Toth, C.E. Harris, Troxclair, Vasut, Cain, Isaac, Dorazio, Harrison, and Schatzline |
2023-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB142 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Law Enforcement
Military & Veterans
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
VOLUNTEERS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Law Enforcement
Military & Veterans
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
VOLUNTEERS